THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARK ST MARYLEBONE (HAMILTON TERRACE)

Charity number: 1155602
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Regular public worship open to all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. Promotion of Christianity through the staging of events and meetings. Promoting the mission of the Church through provision of activities for parents and toddlers.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £273,402
Total expenditure: £358,626

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of Westminster

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 February 2014: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • PCC OF ST MARK'S HAMILTON TERRACE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sally Harrison Trustee 30 May 2021
None on record
James Arthur Stidham Trustee 30 May 2021
None on record
Rev Kathryn Maxine Harrison Trustee 07 July 2018
None on record
IAN DAVID BREAKSPEAR COLLINS Trustee 30 January 2014
None on record
GERLINDA ANNA KATHURIA Trustee 30 January 2014
None on record
NAA-AYELEY ATTOH Trustee 30 January 2014
None on record
EDGAR JAMES ROGERS Trustee 30 January 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £119.34k £115.09k £95.49k £137.75k £273.40k
Total expenditure £121.90k £129.62k £32.50k £123.09k £358.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.49k N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 April 2024 179 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 27 April 2024 179 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 February 2024 486 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 06 April 2024 523 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 March 2021 151 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 March 2021 150 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Marks Church
Hamilton Terrace
LONDON
NW8 9UT
Phone:
02076244065