Financial history HOPE FOR INDIA

Charity Number: 1156828
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £21.85k £20.25k £19.90k £20.20k £18.60k
Total expenditure £25.53k £11.22k £26.17k £19.58k £19.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A