ST MICHAEL'S CENTRE (BISHOP'S CLEEVE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Objective 1: Promoting and advancing all aspects of the Christian faith to the public. Objective 2: Recreational activities particularly in relation to community activities such as holiday clubs for children and young people. Objective 3: Outreach to support those within our community who may be vulnerable, isolated and/or marginalised.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 16 May 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yvonne Mary Penn | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Helen Hazell | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Roland Ekins Watson | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Julie Watson | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tony Dixon | Trustee | 15 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
nigel bennett | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Ross Dyer | Trustee | 16 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Dyer | Trustee | 16 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.45k | £35.32k | £42.34k | £31.35k | £35.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.05k | £23.66k | £31.85k | £25.03k | £34.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.00k | £13.00k | £13.30k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/01/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14/05/2014
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY MEANS OF THE PROVISION, CARE AND MANAGEMENT OF A CENTRE THAT SHALL ACT AS A RESOURCE, TRAINING AND MEETING FACILITY TO ALLOW THE GENERAL PUBLIC ACCESS TO A SELECTION OF LITERARY WORKS AND OTHER MATERIALS RELATING TO THE CHRISTIAN FAITH; (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC RESIDING AT OR NEAR BISHOP'S CLEEVE, CHELTENHAM BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT ITS CENTRE; (3) TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF BISHOP'S CLEEVE, CHELTENHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER. TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. MICHAELS CENTRE
SCHOOL ROAD
BISHOPS CLEEVE
CHELTENHAM
GLOUCESTERSHIRE
GL52 8BA
- Phone:
- 01242673612
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window