FAVELL DAY SERVICES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides day care facilities for recreation and other leisure activities for persons over the age of 18 who have need of these because of their physical disability. The objectives of the care service seek to provide both an enjoyable care environment for its members and provide a break for carers and family members
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 04 June 2015: CIO registration
- FAVELL HOUSE DAY SERVICES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Flynn | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Nicholas Phillip Tack | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Christine Rivett | Trustee | 10 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Michaela Twigg | Trustee | 29 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Jenny Wright | Trustee | 29 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Jean Howell | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||||
GILES HAYDEN WEST | Trustee | 01 November 2015 |
|
|
||||||
William Keith BROOKS | Trustee | 01 November 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.81k | £63.70k | £84.08k | £86.29k | £102.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.14k | £66.64k | £102.52k | £100.48k | £98.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £300 | £11.29k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 14 April 2023 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 14 April 2023 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 11 April 2022 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 11 April 2022 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 19 June 2021 | 80 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 19 June 2021 | 80 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 04 JUN 2015 AMENDED ON 14 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PERSONS OVER THE AGE OF 18 WHO HAVE NEED THEREOF BY REASON OF A PHYSICAL DISABILITY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2a Stanfield Road
Northampton
NN5 6EZ
- Phone:
- 01604585226
- Email:
- trustee@favellds.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window