Financial history SOULBY MEMORIAL HALL TRUST

Charity number: 504517
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £8.80k £13.89k £19.01k £8.24k £10.60k
Total expenditure £7.98k £4.33k £4.72k £10.14k £7.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.33k £16.34k N/A N/A