GREATER MANCHESTER CENTRE FOR VOLUNTARY ORGANISATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GMCVO works to increase economic and social inclusion in Greater Manchester through effective collaborations and supporting other organisations to achieve their goals. We support voluntary organisations and social enterprises to understand the operating environment, to gain social investment and we test new approaches. We provide investment and are a lead body for networks & partnership projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income:
£3,324,605
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £2.46m | |
Other trading activities | £833.08k | |
Investments | £8.44k | |
Other | £21.67k |
Total expenditure:
£3,653,164
Raising funds | £889.74k | |
Charitable activities | £2.76m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,850,233 from 17 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £889.74k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.76m |
People

34 Employee(s)
4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bolton
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Wigan
Governance
- 10 September 1975: Standard registration
- GMCVO (Working name)
- CENTRE FOR VOLUNTARY ORGANISATION (Previous name)
- GREATER MANCHESTER CENTRE FOR VOLUNTARY ORGANISTION (Previous name)
- GREATER MANCHESTER COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY SERVICE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JESSE GARRICK | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
TOM MCGEE | Trustee | 26 August 2016 |
|
|||||
MARK LEE | Trustee | 11 December 2013 |
|
|||||
KATHRYN CHEETHAM | Trustee | 11 December 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.09m | £4.40m | £3.77m | £3.79m | £3.32m | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.35m | £4.19m | £3.01m | £3.55m | £3.65m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £333.28k | £588.16k | £428.19k | £794.51k | £1.85m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £491.34k | £545.00k | £410.04k | £580.07k | £833.08k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £4.57m | £3.82m | £3.33m | £3.20m | £2.46m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.59k | £2.90k | £1.35k | £965 | £8.44k | |
|
Income - Other | £31.81k | £30.47k | £27.56k | £15.00k | £21.67k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £4.73m | £3.50m | £2.51m | £2.94m | £2.76m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £889.74k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £20.59k | £25.10k | £24.74k | £38.60k | £34.98k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.95m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £629.35k | £684.98k | £494.36k | £608.06k | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £64.68k | £56.70k | £40.85k | £34.97k | £84.56k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.82m | £1.71m | £2.77m | £3.50m | £4.29m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.02m | £688.86k | £971.27k | £1.46m | £2.62m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 April 2024 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 April 2024 | 84 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEM AND ARTS INCORP 18 AUGUST 1975 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RES OF 15 JULY 1982 AND 24 MARCH 1994, CERTIFICATE OF INCORP ON CHANGE OF NAME 30 JUNE 1997, SPECIAL RES DATED 06 OCTOBER 2004 AND SPECIAL RES REGIST AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 2 SEPTEMBER 2010.
Charitable objects
1)TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC PRINCIPALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT AREAS OF GREATER MANCHESTER AND ITS ENVIRONS (AREA OF BENEFIT). AND IN PARTICULAR, BUILD THE CAPACITY OF THIRD SECTOR ORGANISATIONS AND PROVIDE THEM WITH THE NECESSARY SUPPORT, INFORMATION AND SERVICES TO ENABLE THEM TO PURSUE OR CONTRIBUTE TO ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE. 2)TO PROMOTE, ORGANISE AND FACILITATE CO-OPERATION AND PARTNERSHIP WORKING BETWEEN THIRD SECTOR, STATUTORY AND OTHER RELEVANT BODIES IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. 3)FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS ARTICLE: (A)'THIRD SECTOR' MEANS CHARITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND SOCIAL ENTERPRISES.(B) 'CHARITIES' ARE ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. (C) 'VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND SOCIAL ENTERPRISES' ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY, AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND SOCIAL ENTERPRISES DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Area of benefit
GREATER MANCHESTER AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GMCVO
ST. THOMAS CENTRE
ARDWICK GREEN NORTH
MANCHESTER
M12 6FZ
- Phone:
- 01612771000
- Email:
- john.hannen@gmcvo.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window