Financial history FRIENDS OF THE FERNS

Charity number: 1157612
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 26/06/2020 26/06/2021 26/06/2022 26/06/2023 26/06/2024
Total gross income £4.93k £2.81k £1.96k £10.47k £1.06k
Total expenditure £4.57k £4.82k £4.55k £4.21k £4.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A