DREAM BIG GHANA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of Dream Big Ghana Foundation (UK) is to raise funds to support the work of Non-Governmental Organisations (NGOs) seeking to relieve poverty in Ghana. Dream Big Ghana Foundation (UK) currently works with three beneficiary organisations: Dream Big Ghana NGO, Denyigba Lorlor NGO and Dream Renewables NGO.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Ghana
Governance
- 09 May 2014: Standard registration
- DBGF (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bryan Pearson | Chair | 13 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Philip Jerry Agblor | Trustee | 14 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ama Williams | Trustee | 28 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Bride | Trustee | 03 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barnaby David King | Trustee | 31 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Charles French | Trustee | 19 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr LINDA EAST | Trustee | 11 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.47k | £85.35k | £77.92k | £100.53k | £99.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.15k | £64.10k | £109.83k | £77.11k | £99.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24 APR 2013 as amended on 20 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
The prevention and relief of poverty, especially but not exclusively in the Volta?Region of Ghana, by: (i) Supporting and encouraging the work of community-based, not-for-profit organisations; (ii) The advancement of education through the physical education and development of children and young people, and through other community-focused education initiatives; (iii) The advancement of environmental protection and improvement, including preservation and conservation of the natural environment and the promotion of sustainable development; (iv)The advancement of arts, culture and heritage through activities and events related to music and other creative ventures; (v) Such other charitable purposes as the trustees for the time being from time to time think fit.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Manor Road
Bingham
NOTTINGHAM
NG13 8EA
- Phone:
- 07584253438
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window