Accounts and annual returns ISRAEL NORMAN SMITH CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1157712
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 10 February 2025 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 10 February 2025 5 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 10 February 2025 371 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 10 February 2025 736 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 10 February 2025 1101 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 10 February 2025 1101 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 22 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 22 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window