Financial history MELTON MENCAP

Charity number: 1157180
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £546.00k £456.66k £498.83k £574.65k £599.56k
Total expenditure £519.33k £473.04k £539.07k £580.06k £591.04k
Income from government contracts £200.00k £137.90k £189.87k £202.55k £267.90k
Income from government grants N/A £165.84k £19.70k £33.15k £12.36k
Income - Donations and legacies £12.44k N/A N/A £26.93k £6.58k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £532.22k N/A N/A £546.76k £591.83k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.34k N/A N/A £206 £385
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A £763 £763
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A £1.84k £647
Expenditure - Charitable activities £517.63k N/A N/A £580.06k £591.04k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £1.71k N/A N/A £11.37k £13.05k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £1.71k N/A N/A £0 £0