Financial history IRISE INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1157722
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £261.27k £186.29k £289.95k £234.42k £200.38k
Total expenditure £188.05k £259.91k £212.40k £230.48k £245.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £52.83k £18.48k £5.00k N/A N/A