Trustees THE NORTHUMBRIA COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1156630
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Robert John Packham Chair 27 May 2022
None on record
Rev DUNCAN CHARLES MACLEAN Trustee 16 April 2025
None on record
Rev Carollyn Elisabeth McDonald Trustee 27 September 2024
None on record
Rev Nicolas Peter Haigh Trustee 10 March 2023
THE FERNHURST VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Rosemary Burke Trustee 08 April 2020
ABRAHAM'S OASIS UK
Received: On time