LONDON SEARCH & RESCUE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is based in London and operates both locally and nationally while assisting the police and other search and rescue teams in the search for vulnerable missing people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 November 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 14 July 2014: Standard registration
- 11 March 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 11 March 2024: Funds transferred to 1192257 LONDON SEARCH & RESCUE
- SELSAR (Previous name)
- SOUTH EAST LONDON SEARCH AND RESCUE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/11/2018 | 01/11/2019 | 01/11/2020 | 01/11/2021 | 01/11/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.66k | £32.36k | £60.48k | £52.25k | £128.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.42k | £16.35k | £47.36k | £42.71k | £58.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 November 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 November 2022 | 17 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2022 | 17 August 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 01 November 2021 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2021 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 01 November 2020 | 25 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2020 | 25 August 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 01 November 2019 | 13 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2019 | 13 August 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24/08/2012 AS AMENDED ON 05/05/2014 AS AMENDED ON 29/06/2014 AS AMENDED ON 05 JAN 2018
Charitable objects
1) TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE GOOD HEATH AND LIFE BY THE PROVISION OF QUALIFIED VOLUNTEERS AND QUALIFIED VOLUNTEER SEARCH DOGS("VOLUNTEERS ") TO ASSIST ORGANISATIONS INVOLVED IN THE SEARCH AND RESCUE OF VULNERABLE, MISSING PERSONS. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO LOWLAND SEARCH AND RESCUE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window