Trustees COMMUNITY PEOPLE MID SUSSEX
Charity Number: 1158780

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James William Baldwin | Chair | 17 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
John Charles Bines | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Dickinson | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Langler | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
David William Mason | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Melissa Katherine Case | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Oswald Mayhew | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Annette Rosalind Capper | Trustee | 23 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gabrielle Gardner | Trustee | 03 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP CHADWELL | Trustee | 17 November 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.