Financial history TRING U3A

Charity number: 1158060
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £7.89k £4.82k £16.69k £18.57k £24.30k
Total expenditure £8.26k £10.79k £18.34k £22.09k £21.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £978 N/A N/A