Financial history FRIENDS OF COLLETT

Charity number: 1157000
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £105.67k £80.37k £81.01k £40.65k £21.58k
Total expenditure £110.24k £62.90k £61.69k £43.96k £40.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A