ACTS FAST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide emotional and practical support to Parents, Carer's and Family members whose child have been affected by childhood sexual abuse. We liken a disclosure irrespective of age to a "bomb going off the shrapnel hitting everyone around" We help build resilience around the trauma. Accessing our support can be by phone, email, text, face to face support in Bournemouth, Poole and Dorchester.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 02 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bournemouth
- Dorset
- Hampshire
- Poole
Governance
- 01 July 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simone Elizabeth Walls-MacDonald | Chair | 06 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Joe Whalen | Trustee | 26 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Vile | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kerensa Butcher | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jill Suckling | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 02/04/2020 | 02/04/2021 | 02/04/2022 | 02/04/2023 | 02/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.59k | £94.39k | £107.86k | £142.97k | £114.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.12k | £92.27k | £105.04k | £90.77k | £148.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £3.25k | £5.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 02 April 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 April 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 02 April 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 April 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 02 April 2022 | 24 April 2023 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
02 April 2022
(These accounts |
24 April 2023 | 81 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 02 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 02 April 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 April 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 01 Jul 2014
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS TO FAMILIES, PARENTS, CARERS AND CHILDREN WHO HAVE BEEN AFFECTED BY SEXUAL ABUSE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ACTS FAST
Unit 5
Manor Farm Business Centre
Gussage St. Michael
Wimborne
Dorset
- Phone:
- 01202 797217
- Email:
- support@actsfast.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window