Financial history SUNBEAMS LONDON LTD

Charity number: 1158753
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £101.05k £230.11k £195.64k £259.02k £360.52k
Total expenditure £88.99k £183.48k £184.69k £254.12k £319.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £24.80k £24.80k £38.80k
Income from government grants £23.18k £27.61k £18.71k £24.99k £112.26k