Backup Tech

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing grants to entertainment technology professionals, or their immediate family, who are seriously ill or injured. Grants may be used for basic living costs, medical related expenses, transportation, retraining, or funerals. Anyone is eligible for assistance who has earned their living in the industry for at least five years working behind the curtain, behind the camera, or on the road.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 November 2014: CIO registration
- BEHIND THE SCENES UK (Previous name)
- BTS UK (Previous name)
- TECH: THE TECHNICAL ENTERTAINMENT CHARITY (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shane McGreevy | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Koy Neminathan | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Burgess | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Scott Arnold | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Robson | Trustee | 29 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter Heath | Trustee | 20 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Piers Shepperd | Trustee | 18 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
RICK FISHER | Trustee | 11 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
LEE DENNISON | Trustee | 11 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £135.59k | £487.12k | £434.62k | £179.01k | £255.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.26k | £292.25k | £367.91k | £225.32k | £221.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 11 NOV 2014 AMENDED ON 11 JUL 2016 as amended on 21 Sep 2020 as amended on 08 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
To relieve persons who have worked in the Entertainment Technology Industry for at least five years, and/or their immediate family members, who are (i) in need by reason of ill-health or injury, (ii) experiencing unexpected financial distress or hardship.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Redoubt House
1b Edward Road
Eastbourne
BN23 8AS
- Phone:
- 0300 302 0068
- Email:
- info@backuptech.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window