Financial history TRINITY CHURCH OXFORD

Charity number: 1157703
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £127.82k £184.11k £132.63k £168.55k £245.87k
Total expenditure £131.29k £136.61k £184.73k £186.56k £206.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A