Financial history GATESHEAD CLUBHOUSE

Charity Number: 1160853
Charity reporting is up to date (42 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £58.39k £44.58k £44.58k £58.59k £40.53k
Total expenditure £52.28k £56.41k £56.41k £51.69k £51.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A