Financial history THE DIDSBURY ARTS FESTIVAL

Charity number: 1158370
Charity reporting is up to date (51 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £66.69k £2.58k £2.20k £13.77k £63.95k
Total expenditure £65.48k £4.87k £7.82k £8.06k £74.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £10.00k N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A