Financial history PEOPLE EXPRESS

Charity number: 1158735
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £192.16k £185.43k £127.92k £140.76k £194.38k
Total expenditure £185.71k £134.34k £144.28k £175.63k £190.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £115.79k £75.88k £103.87k £106.37k £127.85k