Trustees PEOPLE EXPRESS
Charity number: 1158735

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR Chris Baldwin | Chair | 10 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mark Adam Knight | Trustee | 03 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Angela Archer | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neil Johnson | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Edward Clay | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gray Rodgers | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
She/Her Elodie Horsewell | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mamuna Altaf | Trustee | 16 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Helen Litherland | Trustee | 31 March 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.