Financial history SPORTING 87 FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1162311
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £150.83k £132.28k £143.81k £156.29k £150.27k
Total expenditure £130.16k £121.65k £155.12k £169.28k £159.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £250 £22.66k N/A £5.05k N/A