THE FRIENDS OF ASTLEY HALL MUSEUM AND ART GALLERY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Upkeep of the Hall, Promotion and assistance to the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lancashire
Governance
- 29 January 1976: Standard registration
- ASTLEY HALL SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAYNE WARBURTON-BALL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Valerie Fotheringham | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Harrison | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Judith Thorpe | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Wells | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Smith | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
CHERYL HARDYMAN | Trustee | 10 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Iain Willis | Trustee | 10 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Susan Ruff | Trustee | 10 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Helen Lindow | Trustee | 16 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
JEANNIE SHARMAN STIRLING | Trustee | 15 April 2015 |
|
|||||
ANNE KLINKENBERG | Trustee | 13 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
June Molyneaux | Trustee | 18 March 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.94k | £1.05k | £3.17k | £4.31k | £5.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.96k | £2.13k | £10.44k | £5.04k | £682 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 NOVEMBER 1975 AS AMENDED 13TH APRIL 2000. as amended on 09 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE SOCIETY IS TO ASSIST IN THE PRESERVATION OF ASTLEY HALL FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND TO PROMOTE AND IMPROVE THE EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES PROVIDED THEREIN.
Area of benefit
ASTLEY HALL, CHORLEY, LANCASHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 Mimosa Close
CHORLEY
PR7 1BT
- Phone:
- 07884208459
- Email:
- infoastleyfriends@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window