THE GIVING TREE FOUNDATION - TURNING AUTISM AROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide bursaries for means tested severely autistic children between 2 and 5 years old in Greater London and Birmingham for intensive Applied Behavioural Analysis (ABA) therapy through UK Youth Autism Project To provide parent and family support groups in the above areas and to educated these on autism and ABA To promote education and evidence based information sharing in relation to autism
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
- Throughout London
Governance
- 04 August 2014: CIO registration
- TGTF (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cindy-Lee Watts | Chair | 24 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Challen | Trustee | 09 February 2016 |
|
|||||
ALEXANDRA CHANDRIS | Trustee | 04 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
TANJA GULLESTRUP | Trustee | 04 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.16k | £4.50k | £3.86k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.86k | £13.83k | £5.50k | £6.31k | £10.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 04 Aug 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE:(1)TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF CHILDREN WITH AUTISM THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE (2)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO AUTISM. IN ORDER TO FURTHER THE OBJECTS THE GIVING TREE FOUNDATION INTENDS:(A)TO PROVIDE BURSARIES FOR MEANS TESTED SEVERELY AUTISTIC CHILDREN BETWEEN THE AGES OF 2 AND 5 YEARS OLD IN THE GREATER LONDON AND BIRMINGHAM AREAS FOR INTENSIVE APPLIED BEHAVIOURAL ANALYSIS (ABA) THERAPY THROUGH UK YOUTH AUTISM PROJECT. (B)TO PROVIDE PARENT AND FAMILY SUPPORT GROUPS IN THE GREATER LONDON AND BIRMINGHAM AREAS AND TO PROVIDE A PLACE WHERE PEOPLE CAN BE EDUCATED ON AUTISM AND ABA. (C)TO PROMOTE EDUCATION AND EVIDENCE BASED INFORMATION SHARING IN RELATION TO AUTISM THROUGH THE FOUNDATION'S WEBSITE AND MEMBERS' AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Giving Tree Foundation
PO box 74698
London
SW11 9LD
- Phone:
- 07739039364
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window