THE BRITANNIA ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE THE MILITARY EFFICIENCY OF THE ROYAL NAVY. TO RELIEVE WHERE APPROPRIATE PAST AND PRESENT ALUMNI AND WARDROOM STATUS MEMBERS OF STAFF OF THE COLLEGE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 August 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Vincent Halton | Chair | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Bray | Trustee | 19 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Serena Davis | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Graeme Gordon | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Clark | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brian Boxall-Hunt | Trustee | 07 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Timothy John Farrow | Trustee | 14 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARK DOWIE | Trustee | 20 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
ADAM GOSLING | Trustee | 17 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE DIX | Trustee | 11 November 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £315.42k | £171.92k | £332.79k | £263.16k | £265.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £324.31k | £202.29k | £255.82k | £405.05k | £306.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 08 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/07/2014
Charitable objects
1.1.1 TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE ROYAL NAVY BY:- (A) MAINTAINING CONTACT BETWEEN COLLEGE MEMBERS, FOSTERING MUTUAL FRIENDSHIP BETWEEN THEM AND PROVIDING THE MECHANISM AND FRAMEWORK TO FACILITATE SOCIAL GATHERINGS OF THEM (B)FOSTERING ESPRIT DE CORPS, COMRADESHIP AND THE WELFARE OF COLLEGE MEMBERS AND PRESERVING AND EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN THE TRADITIONS OF THE SERVICE AND OF THE COLLEGE 1.1.2 TO RELIEVE WHERE APPROPRIATE COLLEGE MEMBERS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Britannia Royal Naval College
DARTMOUTH
TQ6 0HJ
- Phone:
- 07545317123
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window