Financial history THE TONY AND AUDREY WATSON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1158387
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £187.50k £0 £125.51k £125.23k £0
Total expenditure £102.96k £107.39k £116.98k £128.30k £13.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A