SHERWOOD PRESCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mulberry Pre-School at Howard (trading as Sherwood Pre-School) was established in July 2014 as a charitable institution to serve its local community. The company had been set up as a company limited by guarantee and registered as a charity.Mulberry provides childcare services for up to 32 children aged 2-4 years during normal daily sessions and offer wrap around care for primary school age.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £196,156 from 1 government contract(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Croydon
Governance
- 21 August 2014: Standard registration
- SHERWOOD PRE-SCHOOL (Working name)
- MULBERRY PRE-SCHOOL AT HOWARD (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID NIGEL MATTHEWS BA, NPQH | Chair | 01 July 2014 |
|
|||||
Ian Philip Blamires | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Rosanna Peggy Gourlay | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
PETRONILA MLOWE | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Sabrina Baker | Trustee | 18 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Merilda Carmen Jackson | Trustee | 28 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Reena Ramakrishnan | Trustee | 28 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £265.36k | £246.63k | £249.30k | £269.12k | £279.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £245.07k | £246.06k | £245.04k | £307.04k | £348.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £178.65k | £192.99k | £203.81k | £199.44k | £196.16k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 17 June 2021 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 17 June 2021 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 16 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 16 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 JUL 2014 as amended on 02 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: I) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; II) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sherwood Pre School
7 Nottingham Road
SOUTH CROYDON
Surrey
CR2 6LN
- Phone:
- 07912211830
- Email:
- sherwoodpreschool1@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window