Financial history CLEANCONSCIENCE

Charity number: 1160870
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £86.00k £86.00k £50.68k £60.69k £183.17k
Total expenditure £90.00k £90.00k £83.74k £80.71k £179.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £10.00k N/A N/A N/A