Financial history THE ORGELBÜCHLEIN PROJECT

Charity number: 1159651
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 23/06/2020 23/06/2021 23/06/2022 23/06/2023 23/06/2024
Total gross income £1.00k £0 £5.25k £10.26k £4.33k
Total expenditure £0 £205 £1.53k £6.32k £4.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A