SUB-SAHARA ADVISORY PANEL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is to inspire and inform policy and practice which lead to the reduction of poverty and the achievement of sustainable livelihoods in Africa, with a particular focus on sub-Saharan Africa. We do this through practical policy advice, policy-focused dissemination, debate and applied research. We also work with partners in the public and private sectors across Wales and UK generally.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £34,419 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Algeria
- Angola
- Benin
- Botswana
- Burkina Faso
- Burundi
- Cameroon
- Central African Republic
- Chad
- Comoros
- Congo
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Djibouti
- Egypt
- Equatorial Guinea
- Eritrea
- Eswatini
- Ethiopia
- Gabon
- Ghana
- Guinea
- Guinea-bissau
- Ivory Coast
- Kenya
- Lesotho
- Liberia
- Libya
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Mali
- Mauritania
- Mauritius
- Mayotte
- Morocco
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Niger
- Nigeria
- Réunion
- Rwanda
- Saint Helena
- São Tomé And Principe
- Senegal
- Seychelles
- Sierra Leone
- Somalia
- South Africa
- South Sudan
- Sudan
- Tanzania
- The Gambia
- Togo
- Tunisia
- Uganda
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 19 January 2015: CIO registration
- SSAP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mutale Merrill OBE | Chair | 05 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Loyce Eades | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elemchi Nwosu | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richmond Asante Appah | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Donald Tatenda Mutale | Trustee | 11 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Afoluke Adedapo | Trustee | 11 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Molly Mwila Sexton | Trustee | 11 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Donald Timothy Mlewa Dr | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|||||
TARIG SANOUSI | Trustee | 27 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Fred Zimba | Trustee | 27 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £115.90k | £212.98k | £152.40k | £226.34k | £252.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £99.08k | £161.88k | £150.14k | £228.13k | £295.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £15.53k | £33.76k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £30.86k | £42.54k | N/A | £35.90k | £34.42k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 19 Jan 2015 as amended on 30 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
TO CARRY OUT AND SUPPORT PROGRAMMES IN WALES AND SUB-SAHARAN AFRICA FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF AFRICAN DIASPORA CHARITIES WORKING IN INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT BY PROVIDING SERVICES TO ENSURE GOOD ADMINISTRATION OR INFRASTRUCTURE OF A CHARITY OR CHARITIES, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO PROVIDING ADVICE ON FURTHERING CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND ADVICE ON FUNDRAISING FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES
Area of benefit
SUB-SAHARAN AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 Windsor Place
Cardiff
cf10 3by
- Phone:
- 02920821057
- Email:
- info@ssap.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window