Trustees WITHAM VALLEY NURSERY
Charity number: 1157860

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jenny Canavan | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Thompson | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Dent | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Macinnes | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Galpin | Trustee | 26 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Kimberley Waylen | Trustee | 26 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Nial | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cherilyn Long | Trustee | 23 November 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.