YEOVIL AND BLACKMORE VALE METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide the Circuit churches with human resources (both Ministerial and Lay), pastoral oversight and care, leadership training and education, administration and coordination, all in support of the churches promotion of the Christian faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £1,214 from 1 government grant(s)
People

16 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Dorset
- Somerset
- Wiltshire
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Linda Francis | Chair | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Anne Elizabeth Cook | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Anthony Parsons | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Soon Cheol Choi | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Judy Turner-Smith BA MA DPS | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Kate Elizabeth Konrad | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Fraser Fox | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
JANET AURELIA ENGLISH B Ed | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||
GEOFFREY PHILIP GARDNER | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
HAYDEN CHARLES WILLIAMS ACA | Trustee | 11 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN MARGARET MANN WALSHAM | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Joy Evans | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Colin FARRANT B Sc,MB,BS | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev MARGARET ANN OXENHAM | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
REV CHRISTINA LE MOIGNAN | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN ALLAN WATSON | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £283.24k | £290.97k | £294.07k | £272.81k | £389.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £373.14k | £342.80k | £362.22k | £376.75k | £352.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £2.69k | N/A | £1.21k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 10 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 18 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 18 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 20/09/1932
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Vicarage Street Methodist Church
Vicarage Walk
Middle Street
YEOVIL
BA20 1JZ
- Phone:
- 07423837504
- Email:
- yandbvcircuit@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window