Financial history MIRFIELD COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1159158
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £40.94k £41.92k £53.17k £91.76k £46.21k
Total expenditure £47.85k £46.79k £31.12k £115.09k £62.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £8.00k N/A N/A