ECOTRANSYLVANIA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Carry out and fund research. Enable knowledge and skills transfer. Publish and distribute information resources. Organise and participate in seminars, workshops, courses, conferences and other formal and informal educational activities. Involve volunteers in hands-on conservation activities. Act as a partner in EU-funded collaborative conservation, education and research projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Romania
Governance
- 09 October 2014: CIO registration
- 23 June 2022: Removed (Removed by application)
- 23 June 2022: Funds transferred to 1071012 ANCIENT TREE FORUM
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2017 | 31/05/2018 | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.76k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.63k | £1.90k | £149 | £176 | £181 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 19 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 19 February 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2019 | 21 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2019 | 21 March 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 09 Oct 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS AS SET OUT IN ECOTRANSYLVANIA'S GOVERNING DOCUMENT ARE: (I)TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT ESPECIALLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, IN TRANSYLVANIA, ROMANIA. (II)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT.
Area of benefit
IN TRANSYLVANIA, ROMANIA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window