NORTH SOMERSET PEOPLE FIRST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
North Somerset People First promotes and encourages people with a learning disability, difficulty and/or autism to speak up for themselves, empowering them to be in control of their own lives, now and in the future. We facilitate speaking up forums, consultations, provide person centred planning & advocacy, employment & work experience, accessible training programmes & social events & activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £73,240 from 3 government contract(s) and £50,416 from 4 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bristol City
- North Somerset
- Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 12 November 2014: CIO registration
- PEOPLE FIRST VOICES & CHOICES (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Elizabeth Haros | Chair | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Felicity Keating | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Bird | Trustee | 15 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Kyle Hannan | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £246.03k | £270.08k | £264.94k | £281.92k | £390.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £246.27k | £296.33k | £264.94k | £278.48k | £384.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £44.34k | £65.36k | £97.82k | £73.24k | |
|
Income from government grants | £73.18k | £46.18k | £7.92k | £86.22k | £50.42k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 12 Nov 2014 as amended on 16 May 2023
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONG PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES AND ASSOCIATED CONDITIONS WHO LIVE OR WORK IN THE WEST COUNTRY AND ARE EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY AS A RESULT OF THEIR LEARNING DISABILITIES OR ASSOCIATED CONDITIONS BY: (I) PROVIDING TRAINING, FACILITATION OF WORK OPPORTUNITIES, EDUCATION, INFORMATION, SUPPORT AND SELF-ADVOCACY; (II) RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE ISSUES AFFECTING PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES AND ASSOCIATED CONDITIONS BOTH GENERALLY AND IN RELATION TO THEIR SOCIAL EXCLUSION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Campus
Highlands Lane
Weston-super-Mare
BS24 7DX
- Phone:
- 01934426086
- Email:
- michelle.burnett@nspf.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window