Financial history ROBERT LLOYDS CHARITY

Charity number: 505148
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £63.13k £63.63k £66.24k £60.52k £64.11k
Total expenditure £44.17k £75.92k £45.31k £60.13k £64.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A