FRIENDS OF CANNIZARO PARK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Friends of Cannizaro Park was founded in 1997 and works with Merton Council to protect this 300 year old Grade II* listed garden. The activities of the Friends include a volunteer group to undertake garden maintenance; funding of and fund-raising for planting and restoration; providing information on the park; organizing guided walks for the public; caring for Aviary birds
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Merton
Governance
- 19 March 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Catherine Nelson | Chair | 12 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jane Lavinia Watkins | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Alice Wiley | Trustee | 28 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Liza Llewellyn | Trustee | 28 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anna Watkin | Trustee | 30 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Mary Rink BSc, MPhil | Trustee | 13 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE NEWSHOLME | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simon Mark Ingall | Trustee | 28 January 2019 |
|
|||||
ANNE PEACOCK | Trustee | 19 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.57k | £32.10k | £36.65k | £42.81k | £24.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.36k | £26.02k | £31.70k | £25.27k | £38.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 MAY 1997 AS AMENDED ON 16 MAR 2015 AS AMENDED ON 13 OCT 2019 AS AMENDED ON 23 SEP 2019 as amended on 07 Jun 2021 as amended on 12 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS ARE:(A) TO CONSERVE AND IMPROVE CANNIZARO PARK LOCATED IN WIMBLEDON, LONDON SW19 (‘THE PARK’) AS A PLACE OF HISTORIC AND ECOLOGICAL INTEREST AND BEAUTY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF MERTON AND THE BROADER COMMUNITY OF LONDON AND OTHER INTERESTED PARTIES; (B) TO DO ALL SUCH THINGS AS SHALL BE CONDUCIVE TO THE ATTAINMENT OF THE ABOVE OBJECT INCLUDING: PROMOTING, SUPPORTING AND ASSISTING IN THE (I) CONTINUATION OF THE PARK’S STATUS AS A GRADE II LISTED GARDEN; (II) ENHANCEMENT, MAINTENANCE AND UPKEEP OF THE PARK BY THE LONDON BOROUGH OF MERTON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Willow House
35 High Street
Wimbledon Village
London
SW19 5BY
- Phone:
- 07767 317750
- Email:
- secretary@cannizaropark.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window