Financial history WAYS TO WELLNESS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1161123
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.99m £1.33m £1.25m £1.53m £1.73m
Total expenditure £1.35m £987.17k £723.35k £1.08m £1.13m
Income from government contracts £1.35m £1.04m £1.16m £1.07m £1.20m
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £208.39k £317.43k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £500 £0 £850 £30.13k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.99m £1.32m £1.25m £1.45m £1.52m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £891 £367 £929 £32.20k £108.22k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £46.46k £78.52k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.35m £943.20k £720.50k £1.08m £1.12m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £43.98k £2.85k £1.69k £2.35k
Expenditure - Governance £11.68k £7.50k £10.81k £21.77k £24.47k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £32.78k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0