Trustees WAYS TO WELLNESS FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1161123

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Ruth Cordelia Garnet Briel | Trustee | 29 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emeritus Professor David Hunter | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
BRENDAN TEMPLE HILL | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Guy Stephen Pilkington | Trustee | 18 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Duncan Spurr | Trustee | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARY MADELEINE JORDAN | Trustee | 30 March 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.