Financial history WETHERBY WEIR PRESERVATION TRUST CIO

Charity Number: 1159389
Charity reporting is up to date (46 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £197 £171 £147 £7.06k £4.31k
Total expenditure £264 £274 £910 £10.73k £5.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A