Trustees FOODBANK FOR WHITBY AND DISTRICT
Charity number: 1159269

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARRY GEORGE DAVIES | Chair | 25 September 2014 |
|
|||||
Laura Mary Anderson | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Anne Hutton | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Mary Norval | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WOOLLIN | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
MELANIE ANN TILLEY BSC | Trustee | 25 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Charles Taylor | Trustee | 25 September 2014 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.