Financial history Next Generation Ministries

Charity number: 1164750
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/04/2020 04/04/2021 04/04/2022 04/04/2023 04/04/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £48.08k £58.78k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £41.29k £60.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A