Next Generation Ministies

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Youth and Community Organisation in partnership with schools, social services, young people services, commissioning bodies, youth offending service, families, local, national, voluntary agencies, third sector and private organisations across London to provide effective support solutions for young people and individuals. Promote and implement strategies for the economic regeneration.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 December 2015: CIO registration
- Next Generation Ministries (Working name)
- ANOTHERWAY (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD HUMPHREY | Chair | 26 February 2023 |
|
|||||
ROBERT ADEUSI | Trustee | 13 December 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2020 | 04/04/2021 | 04/04/2022 | 04/04/2023 | 04/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £48.08k | £58.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £41.29k | £60.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2024 | 25 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2024 | 25 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2023 | 04 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2023 | 04 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2021 | 03 February 2023 | 364 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2021 | 03 February 2023 | 364 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2020 | 01 April 2021 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2020 | 01 April 2021 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 08 Dec 2015 as amended on 12 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE FROM THE AGE OF 4-25 LIVING IN LONDON AND UK BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (C) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; (D) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 BEACONSFIELD ROAD
WALTHAMSTOW
LONDON
- Phone:
- 07791446883
- Email:
- contact@anotherway121.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window