THE MWEZI FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Mwezi Foundation provides access to solar lighting to those living without access to mains electricity. In particular we donate solar lights to schools who provide them to their pupils to allow them to study outside of school hours, thereby improving educational opportunities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kenya
- Sierra Leone
Governance
- 06 August 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLAIRE LOUISE PAYE | Chair | 11 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Gary Coltman | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Dawson-Coltman | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Durigan | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL HAMBLIN | Trustee | 15 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.09k | £54.33k | £43.95k | £32.30k | £58.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.89k | £20.62k | £31.23k | £51.33k | £50.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 31 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 01 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 16 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 16 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 03 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 OCT 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23/07/2015 as amended on 23 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
The charity's objects ('Objects') are specifically restricted to the following: (1) To relieve poverty through donating or otherwise facilitating the provision of solar energy to those in need in Kenya or anywhere else in the world that the trustees decide. (2) To advance the education of the public in matters relating to solar energy, climate change and the protection of the environment and to carry out and disseminate the results of research into all aspects of energy generation, distribution, supply and use. (3) To advance education by making grants for the payment of educational fees and the associated costs of attending educational establishments.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Vicarage Road
Henley-on-Thames
RG9 1HJ
- Phone:
- 01491573346
- Email:
- mike@mwezifoundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window