THE PEACE CENTRE UGANDA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
LOVE, CARE AND A HOME FOR UGANDAN ORPHANS We will provide a safe and loving environment that all children feel is a place they can call home. We will provide the basic needs of water, food, clothing and health care. We will provide an education in local schools. We will seek to develop our children?s life skills, providing them with tools to equip themselves for an independent future.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Uganda
Governance
- 23 February 2015: CIO registration
- THE PEACE CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY REICH BA. MA/ED | Chair | 09 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
JENNY STEVENS | Trustee | 09 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANDY CLAPPERTON | Trustee | 09 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MARTIN | Trustee | 09 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.62k | £56.20k | £33.34k | £40.68k | £52.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.57k | £47.83k | £52.03k | £49.37k | £47.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 03 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 03 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 01 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 01 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 12 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 12 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 23 Feb 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF ORPHANED AND VULNERABLE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING AT “THE PEACE CENTRE” IN BUKINDA, SOUTH WEST UGANDA BY:(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING;(B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS; AND (C) THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH. 2) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Beacon Walk
Tenterden
TN30 6SF
- Phone:
- 01580388831
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window