Financial history MOULSHAM LODGE COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1161896
Charity reporting is up to date (23 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £24.69k £6.62k £18.75k £18.01k £17.45k
Total expenditure £39.98k £27.92k £37.60k £20.20k £8.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.58k N/A N/A N/A N/A