BISHOP'S STORTFORD BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
REGULAR PUBLIC WORSHIP, PRAYER, BIBLE STUDY, PREACHING AND TEACHING; BAPTISMS; HOLY COMMUNION; EVANGELISM AND MISSION; TEACHING, ENCOURAGEMENT, WELCOME AND INCLUSION OF YOUNG PEOPLE; NURTURE AND GROWTH OF CHRISTIAN DISCIPLES; EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR CHRISTIAN AND COMMUNITY SERVICE; GIVING AND ENCOURAGING PASTORAL CARE; SUPPORTING AND ENCOURAGING CHARITABLE SOCIAL ACTION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £9,389 from 2 government contract(s) and £9,389 from 2 government grant(s)
People

17 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 04 December 2014: CIO registration
- 09 July 2015: Funds received from 1129822 BISHOP'S STORTFORD BAPTIST CHURCH
- BSBC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JOHN WALFORD | Chair | 18 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Thiego Giovani Fonseca Ribeiro | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen James Lee | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Yvonne Moore | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Talbot | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graham Langhorne Page | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gustavo Gubiani | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Crispin | Trustee | 25 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Church | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Keith Bintley | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Timothy David Wingrave Thomas | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jayne Talbot | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
James Robert Davidson | Trustee | 22 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rupert James Fergus Moore | Trustee | 22 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD PETER JONES | Trustee | 18 September 2014 |
|
|||||
Judith Margaret Box | Trustee | 18 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Julia Catherine Horner | Trustee | 20 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £374.53k | £382.44k | £475.91k | £1.17m | £408.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £397.00k | £387.29k | £461.78k | £1.15m | £437.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £9.39k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £26.18k | £2.31k | N/A | £9.39k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.16m | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6.68k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.91k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £7.98k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.15m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £7.44k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £53.98k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 04 DEC 2014 AMENDED ON 21 SEP 2017 as amended on 27 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH ARE:- 3.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. 3.1.2 THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD. 3.2 [NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHURCH FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 OR SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.]
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bishop's Stortford Baptist Church
Twyford Road
Bishop's Stortford
CM23 3LJ
- Phone:
- 01279 507575
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window